U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04061
  • Case Name: Heine et al v. Pinkelman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2016: [Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2015
  • March 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.