U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05023
  • Case Name: Merrival v. State of South Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 07, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Statement]
  • July 07, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • July 06, 2017: [Supplement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 26, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 14, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 06, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • April 24, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • April 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • April 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 22, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • March 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 01, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Request]
  • February 09, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • February 06, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 25, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Response]
  • January 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • January 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Expedite]
  • January 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 05, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Letter Received]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Leave to]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • January 04, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
  • December 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 11, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 08, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2015: [Letter Received]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order - Notice under Rule 4(m)]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.