U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05024
  • Case Name: Thurston v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 26, 2017: [Objection]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Expedite]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Reverse]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 10, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
  • July 02, 2015: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
  • July 02, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2015
  • March 31, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.