U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04066
  • Case Name: Northwest Bank v. Sovereign Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 07, 2017: [Writ Returned]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 09, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Costs Taxed]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Text Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2016: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 23, 2015: [Brief]
  • July 10, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 10, 2015: [Response]
  • July 10, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2015: [Extend]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2015
  • April 03, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.