U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03005
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ford
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Mail Returned]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.