U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03006
  • Case Name: Newell v. McHugh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 01, 2017: [Extend]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 31, 2017: [Declaration]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • July 27, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 06, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2016: [Extend]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 31, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 31, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Extend]
  • February 16, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 16, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Protective Order]
April, 2015
  • April 06, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.