U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03007
  • Case Name: Crow Dog v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • February 23, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 16, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 16, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Reply]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2015: [Response]
  • September 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 02, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2015
  • April 07, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.