U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05025
  • Case Name: Wyant v. Humble et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Return of Service]
  • May 05, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • April 19, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 03, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Quash]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Request]
  • December 17, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 17, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 14, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 03, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 30, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 06, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 03, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • October 29, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 23, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 01, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
April, 2015
  • April 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.