U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04068
  • Case Name: Clark v. Gross et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2016: [Response]
  • April 14, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 31, 2016: [Brief]
  • March 31, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Brief]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Compel]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 24, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2015: [Compel]
  • December 08, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2015: [Brief]
  • December 08, 2015: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Compel]
  • September 17, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 06, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Supplement]
April, 2015
  • April 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.