U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04070
  • Case Name: Lint v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • December 22, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 16, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 15, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2015
  • April 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.