U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04085
  • Case Name: Welbig v. City of Brookings et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 01, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 05, 2017: [Affidavit]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 29, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Response]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 10, 2016: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • November 10, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Vacate]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 21, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 21, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Extend]
  • October 13, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Leave to]
  • August 05, 2016: [New Trial]
  • August 05, 2016: [Withdraw]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 19, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 19, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 13, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • July 01, 2016: [Verdict]
  • July 01, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 01, 2016: [Jury List]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • June 27, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 25, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 24, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 24, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 23, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 23, 2016: [Response]
  • June 22, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 17, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 16, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 15, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [In Limine]
  • June 14, 2016: [Witness List]
  • June 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • June 14, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • June 08, 2016: [Jury List]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Extend]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 16, 2015: [Redacted Document]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.