U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04086
  • Case Name: Ecolab Inc. v. Jongejeugd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 05, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.