U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05035
  • Case Name: Walker v. Rensch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 13, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 13, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 10, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.