U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04087
  • Case Name: Owen v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 27, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • July 22, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 22, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 08, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Protective Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response]
  • June 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 21, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • June 21, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 29, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extend]
  • February 11, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 10, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 10, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2016: [Strike]
  • January 12, 2016: [Objection]
  • January 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
May, 2015
  • May 07, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.