U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03004
  • Case Name: Uses Many v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Stay]
  • March 20, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 06, 2017: [Response]
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 22, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 02, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 02, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
May, 2015
  • May 08, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.