U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05037
  • Case Name: Walker v. Harmon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 02, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 13, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 30, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 22, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response]
  • August 19, 2016: [Response]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Seal Existing Document]
  • January 19, 2016: [Request]
  • January 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Set Aside Default]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 30, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 22, 2015: [Entry of Default]
  • December 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 18, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2015
  • May 11, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.