U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04089
  • Case Name: South Dakota Network, LLC et al v. Oglala Sioux Tribe Utilities Commission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Proposed Order]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Default Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
May, 2015
  • May 12, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.