U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05038
  • Case Name: Elliott v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 05, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 28, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 11, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2019: [Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 02, 2018: [Letter Received]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Letter Received]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 25, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 28, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 03, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 27, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 12, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 01, 2016: [Extend]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Lis Pendens]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 15, 2016: [Stay]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice]
  • August 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.