U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05017
  • Case Name: Porch et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
May, 2015
  • May 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.