U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04091
  • Case Name: Mokros v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • March 08, 2016: [Stay]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • June 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2015
  • May 16, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.