U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03008
  • Case Name: Springer v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 25, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 17, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 27, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 20, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Brief]
  • June 19, 2015: [Hearing]
  • June 19, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 19, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.