U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05040
  • Case Name: Hybertson v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2015: [Affidavit]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 16, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 16, 2015: [Joinder]
  • November 06, 2015: [Joinder]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2015: [Joinder]
  • September 08, 2015: [Joinder]
  • September 04, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 07, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • August 06, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • August 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 06, 2015: [Affidavit]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2015: [Supplement]
  • June 19, 2015: [Supplement]
  • June 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 16, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.