U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04092
  • Case Name: CenturyLink, Inc. et al v. Oglala Sioux Tribal Utility Commission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Judgment - Default]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • July 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 22, 2015: [Declaration]
  • July 08, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2015
  • May 21, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.