U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01023
  • Case Name: Sioux Rural Water System, Inc. v. City of Watertown et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 14, 2017: [Exclude]
  • August 14, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [In Limine]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 05, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 15, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response]
  • December 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 11, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 07, 2016: [Brief]
  • November 07, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 07, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.