U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04093
  • Case Name: Perfetti Van Melle USA Inc. et al v. Midwest Processing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Quash]
  • May 06, 2016: [Response]
  • May 06, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Writ Returned]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2016: [Declaration]
  • March 04, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
  • February 26, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Leave to]
  • August 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Response to Discovery Request]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order]
  • July 10, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2015: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • July 02, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Default Judgment]
  • June 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 25, 2015: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 24, 2015: [Application]
  • June 24, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 22, 2015: [Show Cause]
  • June 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 22, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
May, 2015
  • May 22, 2015: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.