U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04100
  • Case Name: Dressen et al v. Bauer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 04, 2017: [Brief]
  • April 03, 2017: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2017: [Response]
  • March 24, 2017: [Objection]
  • March 24, 2017: [Jury List]
  • March 24, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • March 21, 2017: [Response]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 09, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [In Limine]
  • January 09, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 09, 2017: [Pretrial Submissions]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
May, 2015
  • May 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.