U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04102
  • Case Name: Koch v. Tracy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 29, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 18, 2016: [Received]
  • February 17, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 15, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Certificate]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 03, 2015: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2015
  • May 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.