U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04099
  • Case Name: Two Bulls v. Ries et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 25, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order]
  • September 24, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 18, 2015: [USCA Order (Limited Remand)]
  • September 18, 2015: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 16, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 31, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 28, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 25, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 21, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 14, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2015
  • May 29, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.