U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01025
  • Case Name: Lopes v. Uttermark et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 01, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • December 22, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 21, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 21, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 04, 2015: [Judgment of Dismissal (Clerk)]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2015: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2015: [Summons Reissued]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 22, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 01, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.