U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04103
  • Case Name: Dale et al v. Kaemingk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 08, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Response]
  • June 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 05, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • March 14, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Reconsideration]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 29, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 18, 2016: [Letter Received]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • January 12, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 23, 2015: [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
  • December 23, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 17, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 17, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Declaration]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 06, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 02, 2015: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 25, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 19, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 19, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 19, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 19, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 16, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • June 02, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.