U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04104
  • Case Name: Miller v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2015: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • August 04, 2015: [Reply]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 30, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • July 01, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Strike]
  • June 26, 2015: [Brief]
  • June 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.