U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03010
  • Case Name: Mohr v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Receipt]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2016: [Brief]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Briefing Schedule]
  • September 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2015: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 13, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • June 04, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.