U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05043
  • Case Name: Quinn et al v. Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Remand]
  • March 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2017: [Remand]
  • March 03, 2017: [Extend]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 22, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 30, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 30, 2015: [Response]
  • December 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Extend]
  • November 09, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Stay]
  • November 09, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • June 30, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • June 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.