U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04106
  • Case Name: Bockholt et al v. Sacred Heart Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 29, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2015: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.