U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03011
  • Case Name: Estrada v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 20, 2016: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Certificate]
  • February 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 31, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 07, 2015: [Mail Returned]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 03, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
June, 2015
  • June 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.