U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04107
  • Case Name: Young v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Letter Received]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • August 07, 2015: [Supplement]
  • August 07, 2015: [Letter Received]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 31, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 30, 2015: [Order]
  • July 10, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 10, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
June, 2015
  • June 09, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.