U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04108
  • Case Name: Gruseth v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Response to Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 12, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2015: [Declaration]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 15, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.