U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cv-05029
  • Case Name: Saltee v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 10, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 01, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • June 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.