U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01024
  • Case Name: Renville v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 13, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 24, 2017: [Response]
  • February 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 04, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 10, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.