U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04109
  • Case Name: Bozied v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2015: [Dismiss]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • August 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • July 08, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 06, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 01, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • June 11, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.