U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05044
  • Case Name: Engesser v. Fox et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 15, 2019: [Costs Taxed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 24, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Response]
  • March 21, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2019: [Response]
  • March 08, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 08, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Deposition]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 29, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 09, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 17, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 16, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 03, 2018: [Certificate]
  • July 03, 2018: [Supplement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2018: [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 15, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 23, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Discovery Report]
  • December 30, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Discovery Report]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 07, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 01, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • September 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 11, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.