U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04110
  • Case Name: Spiger v. United Parcel Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2015: [PHV Fee Paid]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Declaration]
  • June 19, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 12, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • June 12, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 12, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.