U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05045
  • Case Name: Krenz v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2015: [Response]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2015: [Return of Service]
  • July 02, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 02, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order]
  • June 15, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 15, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 15, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.