U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04098
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reverse]
  • September 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 22, 2016: [Reverse]
  • September 14, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • September 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 06, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 02, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2016: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 06, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Response]
  • December 08, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2015: [Response]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 10, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 16, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.