U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05047
  • Case Name: Collins v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Certificate]
  • February 09, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2016: [Leave to]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 12, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 12, 2015: [Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 28, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 23, 2015: [Certificate]
  • October 23, 2015: [Compel]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 04, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
  • September 04, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Notice]
  • August 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 27, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 18, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.