U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05046
  • Case Name: Eagle Aviation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 20, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 18, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.