U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05048
  • Case Name: Larsen v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • July 14, 2016: [Enforce]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 20, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 20, 2016: [Strike]
  • May 18, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 16, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response]
  • May 10, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2016: [Quash]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 28, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order for Form 52]
  • July 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 23, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • July 23, 2015: [Affidavit]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 18, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 18, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.