U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05049
  • Case Name: Richards v. Phipher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Mail Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Mail Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Text Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 19, 2015: [Letter Sent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.