U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04113
  • Case Name: Ditech Mortgage Corp. v. Ditech Financial, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Notice]
  • August 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 05, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 16, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2015: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 22, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2015: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.