U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05050
  • Case Name: Picardi v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • October 29, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Receipt]
  • October 19, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 19, 2018: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • October 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 18, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Response]
  • May 16, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 07, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Text Order]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Reply]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 25, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 25, 2015: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 04, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2015: [Exclude]
  • November 03, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Affidavit]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order]
  • June 23, 2015: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.